Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2021 at 08:07:11 (UTC).

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP v. THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 CELLCO PARTNERSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi, Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-11016

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judges

Zahid N. Quraishi

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP doing business as VERIZON WIRELESS

Defendants

MAYOR MARK WALSIFER

THE MAYOR & COUNCIL OF THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR

COUNCILWOMAN PAT WANN

COUNCILMAN THOMAS BRENNAN

THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR

COUCILMAN JAMES MCCRACKEN

COUNCILMAN TOM CARVELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY D MEESE

Attorney at PRICE, MEESE, SHULMAN & D'ARMINIO PC

50 Tice Boulevard

Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07675

Defendant Attorneys

JERRY J. DASTI

Attorney at DASTI, MURPHY, MCGUCKIN, ULAKY, CHERKOS & CONNORS, PC

The Clock Tower Building, 620 West Lacey Road

Forked River, NJ 08731

NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI

Attorney at BOTTA ANGELI, LLC

50 South Franklin Turnpike

Ramsey, NJ 07446

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JERRY J. DASTI on behalf of All Defendants (DASTI, JERRY) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#9

(#9) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/16/2021. (mg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/16/2021. (mg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#7

(#7) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(ANGELI, NATALIA) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI on behalf of All Defendants (ANGELI, NATALIA) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#5

(#5) Letter from Defendants requesting extension to file time to respond re #1 Complaint. (ANGELI, NATALIA) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP. THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS BRENNAN, TOM CARVELLI, JAMES MCCRACKEN, THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR, THE MAYOR & COUNCIL OF THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR, MARK WALSIFER, PAT WANN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS identifying VERIZON COMUNICATIONS INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12449178), filed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. Magistrate Judge Z. N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. (jem) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JERRY J. DASTI on behalf of All Defendants (DASTI, JERRY) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER attached to docket entry #9 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/16/2021 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/16/2021. (mg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/16/2021. (mg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(ANGELI, NATALIA) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI on behalf of All Defendants (ANGELI, NATALIA) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Defendants requesting extension to file time to respond re #1 Complaint. (ANGELI, NATALIA) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP. THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS BRENNAN, TOM CARVELLI, JAMES MCCRACKEN, THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR, THE MAYOR & COUNCIL OF THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR, MARK WALSIFER, PAT WANN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg, ) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS identifying VERIZON COMUNICATIONS INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12449178), filed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MEESE, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREGORY D MEESE