This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2021 at 08:26:32 (UTC).

Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless) v. The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless filed an Other lawsuit against The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvette Kane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01734

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvette Kane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless)

Defendant

The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Martin Walsh, Jr.

Attorney at Attorney-at-Law

600 Third Avenue

Kingston, PA 18704

Richard M. Williams

Attorney at Hourigan, Kluger and Quinn, P.C.

600 Third Avenue

Kingston, PA 18704-1867

Defendant Attorneys

Brigitte M. Meyer

Attorney at Siana Law

941 Pottstown Pikeste 200

Chester Springs, PA 19425

Michael G Crotty

Attorney at Siana, Bellwoar & McAndrew, LLP

941 Pottstown Pike, Suite 200

Chester Springs, PA 19425

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/18/21. (dmn) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless) identifying Other Affiliate Verizon Communications, Inc. for Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless). (Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brigitte M. Meyer on behalf of The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board. (Meyer, Brigitte) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Crotty on behalf of The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board. (Crotty, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless). The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless). The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Crotty on behalf of The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board. (Crotty, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brigitte M. Meyer on behalf of The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board. (Meyer, Brigitte) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless) identifying Other Affiliate Verizon Communications, Inc. for Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless). (Walsh, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/18/21. (dmn) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Springfield Township Zoning Hearing Board ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5721692), filed by Cellco Partnership (dba Verizon Wireless).(aaa) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant