This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2022 at 07:30:25 (UTC).

Celine SA v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Celine SA filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05501

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celine SA

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

celinebagsales.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kahlia Roe Halpern

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Ste 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

32 #1

Exhibit 1

32 #32

Main Document

31 #1

Exhibit 1

31 #31

Main Document

30 #1

Exhibit A

30 #30

Main Document

#29

(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Celine SA by Kahlia Roe Halpern (Halpern, Kahlia) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#28

(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/10/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

24 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Celine SA (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Celine SA for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MEMORANDUM by Celine SA in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION by Plaintiff Celine SA for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Celine SA for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Celine SA by Kahlia Roe Halpern (Halpern, Kahlia) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: celinebagsales.com added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 11/10/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the circumstances that justified entry of the TRO, the motion for preliminary injunction #24 is granted. Given the answer deadline of 11/28/2022, the tracking status hearing of 11/11/2022 is reset to 12/09/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 12/02/2022. If the Defendants are in default, then the Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment on 12/02/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Celine SA as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin, #2 Exhibit A)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM by Celine SA in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin, #2 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION by Plaintiff Celine SA for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketENTERED IN ERROR. (smb, ) Modified on 10/12/2022 (jn, ). (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Celine SA by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Celine SA by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Celine SA by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Celine SA (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Celine SA (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Celine SA for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Celine SA Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Celine SA; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19921842. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kahlia Roe Halpern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin