Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:00:29 (UTC).

CELGENE CORPORATION v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 CELGENE CORPORATION filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-08758

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CELGENE CORPORATION

Defendants and Counter Claimants

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102-5490

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102-5426

DAVID LEIGH MOSES

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

1037 Raymond Boulevard, Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM C. BATON

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, 1037 Raymond Blvd., Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

LIZA M. WALSH

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

COLLEEN M. MAKER

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN M. MAKER on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (MAKER, COLLEEN) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER Granting #15 Letter application of Liza M. Walsh, Esq. requesting the pro hac vice admission of Jeanna M. Wacker, Esq., Jay P. Lefkowitz, Esq., Kristen P.L. Reichenbach, Esq., Mark C. McLennan, Esq., Jeffrey Coleman, Esq., and Ashley Cade, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/8/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#16

(#16) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Celgene's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims to Complaint.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

15 #7

Certification of Liza M. Walsh

15 #6

Certification of Ashley Cade

15 #5

Certification of Jeffrey Coleman

15 #2

Certification of Jay P. Lefkowitz

15 #1

Certification of Jeanna M. Wacker

#15

(#15) Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jeanna M. Wacker, #2 Certification of Jay P. Lefkowitz, #3 Certification of Kristen P.L. Reichenbach, #4 Certification of Mark C. McLennan, #5 Certification of Jeffrey Coleman, #6 Certification of Ashley Cade, #7 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#8

(#8) Letter from Celgene to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (MOSES, DAVID) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#4

(#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9513293), filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN M. MAKER on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (MAKER, COLLEEN) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#18) TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 3:50 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 7/29/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/12/2019. (jqb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by CELGENE CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/22/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER Granting #15 Letter application of Liza M. Walsh, Esq. requesting the pro hac vice admission of Jeanna M. Wacker, Esq., Jay P. Lefkowitz, Esq., Kristen P.L. Reichenbach, Esq., Mark C. McLennan, Esq., Jeffrey Coleman, Esq., and Ashley Cade, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/8/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Celgene's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims to Complaint.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jeanna M. Wacker, #2 Certification of Jay P. Lefkowitz, #3 Certification of Kristen P.L. Reichenbach, #4 Certification of Mark C. McLennan, #5 Certification of Jeffrey Coleman, #6 Certification of Ashley Cade, #7 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER, dismissing TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED party terminated. Teva Ltd. agrees to be bound by any judgment, Order, or decision in this action or any appeal thereof, as if it were a named defendant, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/19/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (OFOSU-ANTWI, ELEONORE) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CELGENE CORPORATION by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Celgene to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (MOSES, DAVID) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9513293), filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CELGENE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID LEIGH MOSES