This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:07:29 (UTC).

Celestrin et al v. DLY Case Management Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Celestrin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DLY Case Management Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-24465

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carmen Celestrin

Francisco Maldonado

Ricardo Andreu

Defendants

DLY Case Management Services, LLC

Dainelys Cruz

Maikel Lopez, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Juan J. Perez

1414 Nw 107Th Ave., Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Defendant Attorney

Adi Amit

Attorney at Adi Amit, P.A.

101 Ne 3Rd Ave., Suite 300

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit Draft Answer and Affirmative Defenses

12 #12

Main Document

11 #3

Declaration of Maikel Lopez, Sr.

11 #2

Declaration of Dainelys Cruz

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adi Amit on behalf of Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr. Attorney Adi Amit added to party Dainelys Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party DLY Case Management Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party Maikel Lopez, Sr(pty:dft). (Amit, Adi) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#9

(#9) Clerks Entry of Default as to DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Dainelys Cruz, Maikel Lopez, Sr. - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/11/2022. (cds) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit Clerk's Default

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. Dainelys Cruz served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. Maikel Lopez, Sr served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. DLY Case Management Services, LLC served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Filing of Draft Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr re #11 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Answer and Affirmative Defenses) (Amit, Adi) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default by Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dainelys Cruz, #3 Declaration of Maikel Lopez, Sr.)(Amit, Adi) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adi Amit on behalf of Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr. Attorney Adi Amit added to party Dainelys Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party DLY Case Management Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adi Amit added to party Maikel Lopez, Sr(pty:dft). (Amit, Adi) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Entry of Default as to DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Dainelys Cruz, Maikel Lopez, Sr. - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/11/2022. (cds) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clerk's Default)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. Dainelys Cruz served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. Maikel Lopez, Sr served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. DLY Case Management Services, LLC served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff. Party(s) Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado added to plaintiffs group of record, represented by Nathaly Saavedra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" Francisco Maldonado's Notice of Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B" Carmen Celestrin's Notice of Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C" Ricardo Andreu's Notice of Consent to Join) (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr. (drz) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dainelys Cruz, DLY Case Management Services, LLC, Maikel Lopez, Sr. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15278541, filed by Ricardo Andreu, Carmen Celestrin, Francisco Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adi Amit