This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:37:21 (UTC).

Celera Telecom Ltd. v. Adolos, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Celera Telecom Ltd filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Adolos, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Celera Telecom Ltd.

Logik Communications Pte., Ltd.

Defendants

Mary E. Mooney

Adolos, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge Perez-Santiago

Attorney at Stumphauzer Foslid Sloman Ross & Kolaya

Suite 2550, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Ian M. Ross

Attorney at Stumphauzer Foslid Sloman Kolaya & Ross, PLLc

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131-1824

Adam Michael Foslid

Attorney at Stumphauzer Foslid Sloman Ross & Kolaya

Suite 2550, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Cullin Avram O'Brien

Attorney at Cullin O'Brien Law, P.A.

6541 Ne 21St Way

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33308

 

Court Documents

15 #4

Exhibit Celera's Operative Complaint in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Co

15 #3

Exhibit Celera's Complaint in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communicatio

15 #2

Exhibit Celera's Initial Brief in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communic

15 #1

Exhibit Excerpt of Transcript of the July 31, 2019 Proceedings in Celera Telecom

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATIVE MOTIONS FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE by Adolos, LLC, Mary E. Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Transcript of the July 31, 2019 Proceedings in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11-2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct.), 7/31/19 Tr. at 172:11-17, #2 Exhibit Celera's Initial Brief in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 20-55 (Fla. 2d DCA), #3 Exhibit Celera's Complaint in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, Case No: 2:18-cv-431-FtM-99CM (M.D. Fla.), #4 Exhibit Celera's Operative Complaint in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11-2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct.))(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#14

(#14) PROOF of service by Celera Telecom Ltd. (Perez-Santiago, Jorge) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#13

(#13) PROOF of service by Celera Telecom Ltd. (Perez-Santiago, Jorge) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit C - Sample Emails

11 #2

Exhibit B - Adolos Agreement

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Celera Telecom Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Celera Telecom Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Services and Financing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Adolos Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Emails, #4 Exhibit D - Interconnect Agreement)(Foslid, Adam) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

7 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H - Docket Sheet in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communicati

7 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v

7 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F- Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v.

7 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v

7 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Mary E. Mooney, With Picture, Video Hyperlink

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v

#7

(#7) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically MOTION To Dismiss the Complaint and alternatively for a more definite statement and to strike by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, Case No: 2:18-cv-431-FtM-99CM, [Dkt. Nos. 7--8] (M.D. Fla. June 29, 2018), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Mary E. Mooney, With Picture, Video Hyperlinks, and Papers Left on Doorstep, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., December 6, 2019) (Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., December 6, 2019) (Order Granting Summary Judgment Against Celera), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., January 8, 2020) (Transcript Excerpt), #6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., September 27, 2019) (Motion to Disqualify), #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct.) (Order Denying Celera's Motion to Disqualify), #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Docket Sheet in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, 2D20-55 (Fla. 2d DCA))(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATIVE MOTIONS FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO STRIKE by Adolos, LLC, Mary E. Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Transcript of the July 31, 2019 Proceedings in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11-2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct.), 7/31/19 Tr. at 172:11-17, #2 Exhibit Celera's Initial Brief in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 20-55 (Fla. 2d DCA), #3 Exhibit Celera's Complaint in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, Case No: 2:18-cv-431-FtM-99CM (M.D. Fla.), #4 Exhibit Celera's Operative Complaint in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11-2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct.))(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF of service by Celera Telecom Ltd. (Perez-Santiago, Jorge) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF of service by Celera Telecom Ltd. (Perez-Santiago, Jorge) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #7) because Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. #11). See Malowney v. Fed. Collection Deposit Grp., 193 F.3d 1342, 1345 n.1 (11th Cir. 1999). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/22/2020. (KRH) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Celera Telecom Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Celera Telecom Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Services and Financing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Adolos Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Emails, #4 Exhibit D - Interconnect Agreement)(Foslid, Adam) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2020 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. All parties to appear by telephone. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587, SECURITY CODE: 20157. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than [5/11/2020]. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (jmc) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Unopposed [sic] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Alternate Motions for a More Definite Statement and to Strike. Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Motion (Doc. #7) on or before 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/9/2020. (NM) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Dismiss by Celera Telecom Ltd. (Perez-Santiago, Jorge) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically MOTION To Dismiss the Complaint and alternatively for a more definite statement and to strike by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, Case No: 2:18-cv-431-FtM-99CM, [Dkt. Nos. 7--8] (M.D. Fla. June 29, 2018), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Mary E. Mooney, With Picture, Video Hyperlinks, and Papers Left on Doorstep, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., December 6, 2019) (Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., December 6, 2019) (Order Granting Summary Judgment Against Celera), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., January 8, 2020) (Transcript Excerpt), #6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct., September 27, 2019) (Motion to Disqualify), #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, No. 11- 2018-CA-001877-0001-XX (Collier Cnty. FL, Cir. Ct.) (Order Denying Celera's Motion to Disqualify), #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Docket Sheet in Celera Telecom Ltd., f/k/a Logik Communications Pte, Ltd., v. Exclusive Group LLC, 2D20-55 (Fla. 2d DCA))(O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 track two notice and corporate disclosure order by Celera Telecom Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Celera Networks Limited for Celera Telecom Ltd. (Foslid, Adam) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/2/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/19/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Mary E. Mooney. (MLJ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Adolos, LLC. (MLJ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-157-FtM-38MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16565274) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Services and Financing Agreement, #5 Exhibit B - Agreement, #6 Exhibit C - Interconnect Agreement)(Foslid, Adam) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Logik Communications Pte., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Michael Foslid

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian M. Ross