This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 08:42:50 (UTC).

Celebration IP LLC v. Monolithic Power Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Celebration IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Monolithic Power Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01589

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celebration IP LLC

Defendants

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc

Monolithic Power Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip P Mann

Attorney at MANN LAW GROUP PLLC

1420 Fifth Avenue, Ste 2200

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)

1 #5

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/7/2020. (LC) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Celebration IP LLC (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Monolithic Power Systems Inc. (RE) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Celebration IP LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/6/2020. (RE) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Monolithic Power Systems, Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6702708) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Celebration IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Celebration IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Mann, Philip) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Celebration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip P Mann