This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:49:46 (UTC).

Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth dba City on a Hill v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth dba City on a Hill filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01012

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth dba City on a Hill

Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth, Inc.

Defendant

Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Dale Green

Attorney at Green & Klein

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Hunter Milam Klein

Attorney at Robert D Green & Associates PC

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Robert P Woodliff

Attorney at Araiza & Woodliff

4144 North Central Expressway, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

David B Dowell

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

306 W. 7Th Street, Suite 405

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Jennifer Gibbins Durbin

Attorney at Allen Stein & Durbin PC

6243 Ih 10 West, Suite 700

San Antonio, TX 75041

Amanda Louise Hazleton

Attorney at Allen Stein & Durbin PC

6243 Ih 10 West, 7Th Floor, Po Box 101507

San Antonio, TX 78201

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Appendix in Support filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from District Court, Tarrant County, 352nd District, case number 352-312812-19 filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10458583) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2020. Motions due by 11/9/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/9/2020. Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Pretrial Order due by 2/11/2021. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning March 8, 2021 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/21/2020) (skg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

#8

(#8) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 17, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/19/2019) (skg) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth, Inc.. (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Supplemental Document by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Defendant's Original Answer. (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit(s)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Milam Klein for Robert P. Woodliff on behalf of Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth, Inc.. (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Defendant must file an amended notice of removal addressing the pleading defects identified by the Court by Monday, December 30, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/6/2019) (skg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#7

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. Amended Notice of Removal. (Hazleton, Amanda) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Tue Jan 21 16:16:02 CST 2020 (crt) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2020. Motions due by 11/9/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/9/2020. Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Pretrial Order due by 2/11/2021. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning March 8, 2021 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/21/2020) (skg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth, Inc.. (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hunter Milam Klein for Robert P. Woodliff on behalf of Celebration Baptist Church of Fort Worth, Inc.. (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 17, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/19/2019) (skg) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. Amended Notice of Removal. (Hazleton, Amanda) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Defendant must file an amended notice of removal addressing the pleading defects identified by the Court by Monday, December 30, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/6/2019) (skg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental Document by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Defendant's Original Answer. (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Appendix in Support filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from District Court, Tarrant County, 352nd District, case number 352-312812-19 filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10458583) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) (Durbin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.