This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 08:18:06 (UTC).

Ceja Mendoza v. Valone et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Ceja Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Valone. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and John A. Jarvey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00416

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelica Karina Ceja Mendoza

Defendants

Ross Valone

Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp.

Mercy Medical Center

Primary Health Care, Inc.

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Sahag

Attorney at DICKEY & CAMPBELL LAW FIRM PLC

301 East Walnut, Suite 1

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

William C Purdy

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - DSM

110 E Court Ave, Suite 286

Des Moines, IA 50309

Brian J Humke

Attorney at NYEMASTER GOODE PC

1416 Buckeye Ave, Suite 200

Ames, IA 50010

Stacie M Codr

Attorney at FINLEY LAW FIRM

699 Walnut Street, 1700 Hub Tower

Des Moines, IA 50309-3773

Joseph F Moser

Attorney at FINLEY LAW FIRM

699 Walnut Street, 1700 Hub Tower

Des Moines, IA 50309-3773

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian J. Humke by Primary Health Care, Inc., Ross Valone.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Humke, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Party. No resistance having been filed, this Motion is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/13/2020. (mlr) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Moser on behalf of Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp. (Moser, Joseph) Modified on 1/9/2020 to remove party (rmj). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp. (Codr, Stacie) Modified on 1/9/2020 to remove party (rmj). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie M Codr on behalf of Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp. (Codr, Stacie) Modified on 1/9/2020 to remove second party. (rmj). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

4 #2

Memorandum of Authorities

4 #1

Exhibit A - B

#4

(#4) MOTION to Substitute Party by Primary Health Care, Inc., Ross Valone.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Memorandum of Authorities)(Purdy, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Primary Health Care, Inc., Ross Valone re #1 Notice of Removal by USA Local Rule 81.1 List (Purdy, William) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY USA by Ross Valone, Primary Health Care, Inc. from Polk County, case number LACL145775., filed by Ross Valone, Primary Health Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Purdy, William) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian J Humke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/14/2020. (keh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian J. Humke by Primary Health Care, Inc., Ross Valone.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Humke, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Party. No resistance having been filed, this Motion is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/13/2020. (mlr) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Moser on behalf of Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp. (Moser, Joseph) Modified on 1/9/2020 to remove party (rmj). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp. (Codr, Stacie) Modified on 1/9/2020 to remove party (rmj). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie M Codr on behalf of Catholic Health Initiatives-Iowa Corp. (Codr, Stacie) Modified on 1/9/2020 to remove second party. (rmj). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Substitute Party by Primary Health Care, Inc., Ross Valone.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Memorandum of Authorities)(Purdy, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (don) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Primary Health Care, Inc., Ross Valone re #1 Notice of Removal by USA Local Rule 81.1 List (Purdy, William) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY USA by Ross Valone, Primary Health Care, Inc. from Polk County, case number LACL145775., filed by Ross Valone, Primary Health Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Purdy, William) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.