Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 15:22:06 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Whirlpool Corporation

Case Summary

On April 13, 2021, Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (“Plaintiff”), represented by David W. deBruin of Gawthrop Greenwood, PC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Whirlpool Corporation (“Defendant”), seeking adequate compensation and an accounting of damages along with the awarded costs for allegedly infringing the patent relating to methods for translating a device command owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware with Judge Richard G. Andrews presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “The ’867 Patent is entitled “Methods for translating a device command,” and issued 2012-04-24. The application leading to the ’867 Patent was filed on 2000-09-15. A true and correct copy of the ’867 Patent is attached hereto as Exhibit 1 and incorporated herein by reference.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’867 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’867 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’867 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’867 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

 

The Plaintiff even further alleged that “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’867 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products. The service of this Complaint, in conjunction with the attached claim charts and references cited, constitutes actual knowledge of infringement as alleged here.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’867 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’867 Patent. See Exhibit 2 (extensively referencing these materials to demonstrate how they direct end users to commit patent infringement).”

 

The Plaintiff furthermore alleged that “At least since being served by this Complaint and corresponding claim charts, Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the ’867 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’867 Patent.” 

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘867 Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to adjudicate that Defendant has infringed the patents owned by Plaintiff, an accounting of all damages and an adequate compensation along with prejudgment and post-judgment interest. Plaintiff further requested the court to grant costs of litigation to Plaintiff.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00529

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Whirlpool Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Order

#12

(#12) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,165,867. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#11

(#11) SO ORDERED Granting #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2021. (nms) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to Whirlpool Corporation (deBruin, David) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

9 #1

Certification for Allison Elizabeth Kerndt

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison Elizabeth Kerndt - filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/20/2021 (nms). (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/6/2021 (nms). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Whirlpool Corporation served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Whirlpool Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3592190.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,165,867. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SO ORDERED Granting #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/3/2021. (nms) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to Whirlpool Corporation (deBruin, David) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison Elizabeth Kerndt, filed by Whirlpool Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/20/2021. (nms) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison Elizabeth Kerndt - filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/20/2021 (nms). (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Whirlpool Corporation answer due 6/7/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/6/2021. (nms) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/6/2021 (nms). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00528-RGA, 1:21-cv-00529-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Whirlpool Corporation served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,165,867. (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Whirlpool Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3592190.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel M. Silver