This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2023 at 07:54:56 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. VIA Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against VIA Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

VIA Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to VIA Technologies, Inc. (zv) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to VIA Technologies, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to VIA Technologies, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to VIA Technologies, Inc. (zv) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Office contacted the Plaintiff's counsel due to Document #4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS being the incorrect document e-filed. Counsel needs to refile the correct REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS in order for the Clerk's Office to proceed with the issuance of summons. (zv) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketCase directly assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland due to previously filed cases as having same Plaintiff and patent case number(s). CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketPlease remember to comply with the standing orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (zv) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16901437), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less