This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 10:35:27 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Unitech America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Unitech America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00387

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Unitech America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Isaac Phillip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all pending claims and causes of action against Defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Unitech America, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Unitech America, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unitech America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Unitech Electronics Co., Ltd. for Unitech America, Inc., Unitech America, Inc.. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. by Unitech America, Inc..(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Rule 12(b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Unitech America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Unitech America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all pending claims and causes of action against Defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Unitech America, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Unitech America, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unitech America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Unitech Electronics Co., Ltd. for Unitech America, Inc., Unitech America, Inc.. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. by Unitech America, Inc..(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Rule 12(b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Unitech America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Unitech America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Unitech America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8627328.), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo Joel Bonilla