This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:38:02 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Source Technologies Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Source Technologies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01441

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Source Technologies Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Source Technologies Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#8

(#8) STATUS Report and Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 11/23/2021 (nms). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED Granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Source Technologies Inc. answer due 12/22/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/23/2021. (nms) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS Report and Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 11/23/2021 (nms). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER: An answer was due to be filed on 11/16/2021 (see D.I. #6 ), and to date none has been filed. Plaintiff is now directed to file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2021. (nms) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Source Technologies Inc. served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 6 has been removed from the docket as it was filed using an incorrect code. Counsel is to refile this document using the "Summons Returned Executed" code thereby allowing an answer date to be set. (nms) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 6 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request as one of the dates was incorrect. A corrected executed summons will be refiled. (nms) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Source Technologies Inc. on 10/12/2021. (srs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (srs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,972,790 ;8,537,242. (srs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Source Technologies Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3718564.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin