This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:49:05 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Sonim Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sonim Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01047

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Sonim Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W. Monroe St.

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Sonim Technologies, Inc. answer due 1/21/2021. (lad) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. THE COURT, having considered Plaintiff Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. and Defendant Sonim Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Extension, HEREBY ORDERS that Defendant Sonim's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including January 21, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Sonim Technologies, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14178349), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness In Patent Cases v2. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonim Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff