This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 09:22:39 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Reolink Digital Technology Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00608

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant Attorney

Lance E. Wyatt, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd. served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#7

(#7) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14904214), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd. answer due 8/23/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Based on Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than August 23, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd. served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Reolink Digital Technology Co., Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14904214), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr