This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 08:18:44 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Omron Electronics LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Omron Electronics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01397

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Omron Electronics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Defendant Attorney

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Omron Electronics LLC served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint - filed by Omron Electronics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/28/2021 (nms). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Omron Electronics LLC answer due 11/29/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/28/2021. (nms) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint - filed by Omron Electronics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/28/2021 (nms). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Omron Electronics LLC served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Omron Electronics LLC on 9/30/2021. (srs) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (srs) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,972,790 ;8,537,242. (srs) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Omron Electronics LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3711010.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant