This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2020 at 12:21:00 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Mouser Electronics Inc

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mouser Electronics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00179

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Mouser Electronics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Phillip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Colleen Elizabeth McKnight

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP - Houston

2000 Wells Fargo Plaza, 1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mouser Electronics Inc.( McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mouser Electronics Inc.( McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Mouser Electronics Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Mouser Electronics Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7825139.), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mouser Electronics Inc to 8/16/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mouser Electronics Inc.( McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mouser Electronics Inc to 8/1/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mouser Electronics Inc.( McKnight, Colleen) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Mouser Electronics Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Mouser Electronics Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7825139.), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mouser Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen McKnight