This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:57:07 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Honda Motor Company, Ltd.

Case Summary

On January 21, 2022, Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Honda Motor Company, Ltd. (“Defendant”), seeking disbursement, costs and damages, along with pre- and post-judgement interest and other reliefs, for the Defendant’s alleged infringement of United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent Nos.

6,972,790 and 8,537,242 (the “Patents-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’790 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’790 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’790 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’790 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Despite actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’790 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’790 Patent.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’242 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’242 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’242 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’242 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers. Despite actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’242 Patent.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which deal with the alleged infringement of the Patents-in-Suit owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for a judgment that the Patents-in-Suit are valid and enforceable; a judgment that the Defendant has infringed, directly and indirectly, one or more claims of the Patents-in-Suit; and for damages including pre- or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements. The Plaintiff also requested that the Court declare that this case is exceptional within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and that Plaintiff be awarded its reasonable attorney’s fees along with such further relief at law or in equity as the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Honda Motor Company, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15635435), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Documents received in Clerk's Office for foreign service via FedEx. Pickup info included.(lad) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Documents received in Clerk's Office for foreign service via FedEx. Pickup info included.(lad) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15635435), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA MOTOR COMPANY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff