Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 15:21:52 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 13, 2021, Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (“Plaintiff”), represented by David W. deBruin of Gawthrop Greenwood, PC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages, an accounting of all damages among other reliefs for alleged infringement of patented technology related to methods for translating a device command owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware with Judge Richard G. Andrews presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “Plaintiff is the assignee of all right, title and interest in United States Patent No. 8,165,867 (the “Patent-in-Suit”); including all rights to enforce and prosecute actions for infringement and to collect damages for all relevant times against infringers of the Patent-in-Suit. Accordingly, Plaintiff possesses the exclusive right and standing to prosecute the present action for infringement of the Patent-in-Suit by Defendant.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’867 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’867 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’867 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’867 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’867 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’867 Patent. See Exhibit 2 (extensively referencing these materials to demonstrate how they direct end users to commit patent infringement),” and that “At least since being served by this Complaint and corresponding claim charts, Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the ’867 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’867 Patent.”

 

In the only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, alleged infringement of one or more claims of ‘867 Patent has been claimed. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to declare that ’867 Patent is valid and enforceable, and pass a judgment that Defendant has infringed directly and indirectly one or more claims of the ’867 Patent. Plaintiff further requested the Court to order an accounting of all damages, award damages to Plaintiff including pre- or post-judgment interest, along with costs of litigation. 

 

Disclaimer: This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.









 



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00528

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 5/20/2021 (nms). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nms). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,165,867. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3592146.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time filed (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/7/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/20/2021. (nms) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 5/20/2021 (nms). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. answer due 6/7/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/21/2021. (nms) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 4/21/2021 (nms). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00528-RGA, 1:21-cv-00529-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,165,867. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Haier US Appliance Solutions, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3592146.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAIER US APPLIANCESOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin