This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 08:16:02 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. GoPro, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GoPro, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01319

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

GoPro, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Order

#9

(#9) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,473,527; 6,972,790; 8,537,242. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#8

(#8) SO ORDERED Granting #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/12/2021. (nms) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to GoPro, Inc. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. GoPro, Inc. served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,473,527; 6,972,790; 8,537,242. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SO ORDERED Granting #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/12/2021. (nms) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to GoPro, Inc. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. GoPro, Inc. served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to GoPro, Inc. on 9/17/2021. (smg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (smg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,473,527 ;6,972,790 ;8,537,242. (smg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against GoPro, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3701228.) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOPRO, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin