This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 09:25:22 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Expedia, Inc.

Case Summary

 

On March 11, 2021, Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (“Plaintiff”), represented by Isaac Rabicoff of Rabicoff Law LLC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Expedia, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages and costs of litigation among other reliefs for allegedly infringing Plaintiff’s intellectual property relating to Graphic-information flow method and system for visually analyzing patterns and relationships. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Number 8,397,177 entitled “Graphic-information flow method and system for visually analyzing patterns and relationships” (the ‘177 Patent or “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by Plaintiff. 

 

Plaintiff in its complaint alleged that “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’177 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’177 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated

into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’177 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’177 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its

Customers.” and that “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the

doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’177 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products.”



Plaintiff further alleged that “Despite such actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’177 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant has also continued to sell the Exemplary Defendant Products and distribute product literature and website materials inducing end users and others to use its products in the customary and intended manner that infringes the ’177 Patent. See Exhibit 2 (extensively referencing these materials to demonstrate how they direct end users to commit patent infringement).”

 

Plaintiff even further alleged that “At least since being served by this Complaint and corresponding claim charts, Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the ’177 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’177 Patent.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘177 Patent.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that the ’177 Patent is valid and enforceable, that Defendant has infringed the ‘177 patent. Plaintiff further requested the court to order an accounting of all damages and to award Plaintiff appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 including pre- or post-judgment interest along with costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Expedia, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant Attorney

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Expedia, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 2.4

1 #4

Exhibit 2.3

1 #3

Exhibit 2.2

1 #2

Exhibit 2.1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14578802), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2.1, #3 Exhibit 2.2, #4 Exhibit 2.3, #5 Exhibit 2.4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Expedia, Inc. answer due 5/21/2021. (mn) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Expedia, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended until May 21, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JZ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Expedia, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14578802), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2.1, #3 Exhibit 2.2, #4 Exhibit 2.3, #5 Exhibit 2.4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Expedia, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Arnette Amstutz