This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2021 at 09:25:12 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Belkin International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Belkin International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00404

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Belkin International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Belkin International, Inc. answer due 5/27/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2021. (nms) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS Letter and Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (deBruin, David) Modified on 4/15/2021 (nms). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER: An answer was due to be filed on 4/12/2021 (see D.I. #6 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2021. (nms) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00388-RGA, 1:21-cv-00393-RGA, 1:21-cv-00394-RGA, 1:21-cv-00404-RGA, 1:21-cv-00405-RGA and 1:21-cv-00411-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Belkin International, Inc. served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,165,867. (nmg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Belkin International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3575406) - filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin