This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 08:32:04 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Arashi Vision Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arashi Vision Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant

Arashi Vision Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

(#7) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Arashi Vision Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to Arashi Vision Inc.. Waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. as to Arashi Vision Inc.. Waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. Arashi Vision Inc. served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arashi Vision Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jc5) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (jc5) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15230300), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Philip Rabicoff