This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 07:28:31 (UTC).

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Ambir Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Cedar Lane Technologies Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ambir Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05457

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Ambir Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Isaac Philip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

5680 King Centre Dr, Suite 645

Alexandria, VA 22315

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr.

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Streetsuite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J. Mcnabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.c.

1717 Main Streetsuite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: On 12/8/2021, the parties filed a jointly-executed stipulation of dismissal #11 explaining that they jointly stipulate to the dismissal of this action. Accordingly, the claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, and the counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice, based on the terms of the parties' stipulation and by operation of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Nelson v. Napolitano, 657 F.3d 586, 587 (7th Cir. 2011) (Rule 41(a)(1)(A) notice of dismissal "is self-executing and effective without further action from the court"). Each party is to bear its own fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to counterclaim by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: The motion of counsel Lance Wyatt to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Counsel is directed to review LR 83.15(a) and to be prepared to designate local counsel. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18869017. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ambir Technology, Inc. (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Ambir Technology, Inc. against Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. . by Ambir Technology, Inc.(Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 10/21/2021: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 10:10 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#4

(#4) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: On 12/8/2021, the parties filed a jointly-executed stipulation of dismissal #11 explaining that they jointly stipulate to the dismissal of this action. Accordingly, the claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, and the counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice, based on the terms of the parties' stipulation and by operation of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Nelson v. Napolitano, 657 F.3d 586, 587 (7th Cir. 2011) (Rule 41(a)(1)(A) notice of dismissal "is self-executing and effective without further action from the court"). Each party is to bear its own fees and costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to counterclaim by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: The motion of counsel Lance Wyatt to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Counsel is directed to review LR 83.15(a) and to be prepared to designate local counsel. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18869017. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ambir Technology, Inc. (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Ambir Technology, Inc. against Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. . by Ambir Technology, Inc.(Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 10/21/2021: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 10:10 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jg, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ambir Technology, Inc. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/15/2021) (jg, ). (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. by Isaac Philip Rabicoff (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18767269. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Eric Wyatt, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay