This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:21:02 (UTC).

Cecilia Granata v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Cecilia Granata filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cecilia Granata

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

jinankaiyuedianzishangwuyouxiangongsi

Zhoukoushichaoliangshangmaoyouxiangongsi

xiangchengshijieshengshangmaoyouxiangongsi

DesDirect Vi

BaoFengXianChengGuanZhenMaShanShanFuZhuangDian

Marilyn Monroee

LiuHongJundianpu

HawPoeStore

Markus Store

Valerie W Crane

ZIWEIDIAN

weiqundi

Zhaofei SM

Retro LL iron sheet

xixianxinqufengdongxinchengchangheyubaihuodian

daqiangqiang

Wu Suo Wei Jv Art

liuyining1

239 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Other Attorneys

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman Llp

One Penn Plaza, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #35 , this case can be dismissed without prejudice. No defendants remain in the case. Any hearing dates before this Court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#33

(#33) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant No. 145 chenlihengwin (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#32

(#32) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER as to certain defendants signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/16/2022: Motion for default judgment #29 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#31

(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant chenlihengwin by Yong Chen (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

30 #2

Exhibit 2

30 #1

Exhibit 1

#29

(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Cecilia Granata for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cecilia Granata by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cecilia Granata by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) EXHIBITS-SCHEDULE A filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Granata Schedule A to Complaint #1 . (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 1/21/2022 (jh, ). (Entered: 01/05/2022)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #35 , this case can be dismissed without prejudice. No defendants remain in the case. Any hearing dates before this Court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant No. 145 chenlihengwin (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER as to certain defendants signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/16/2022: Motion for default judgment #29 is granted. (mk) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant chenlihengwin by Yong Chen (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MEMORANDUM by Cecilia Granata in support of motion for default judgment #29 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Cecilia Granata for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Cecilia Granata for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ng, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cecilia Granata by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cecilia Granata by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cecilia Granata by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cecilia Granata by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBITS-SCHEDULE A filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Granata Schedule A to Complaint #1 . (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 1/21/2022 (jh, ). (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cecilia Granata; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19022239. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen