This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 10:13:21 (UTC).

Cebollero-Bertran v. Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Cebollero-Bertran filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carmen C. Cerezo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01412

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carmen C. Cerezo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ms. Natalia Cebollero-Bertran

Defendant

Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edelmiro Antonio Salas-Gonzalez

1072 17Th St., Villa Nevarez

San Juan, PR 00927

Jose L. Ramirez-de-Leon

Attorney at Jose L. Ramirez De Leon, LLM

P.O. Box 190251

San Juan, PR 00919-0251

Defendant Attorneys

Jorge Marrero-Narvaez

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

P.O. Box 7066, 620-2227 X 2659 Or X2668, Fax: 620-3830

San Juan, PR 00916-7066

Carlos R. Ramirez-Isern

Attorney at Bennazar, Garcia & Milian, CSP

416 Ponce De Leon

San Juan, PR 00918

A. J. Bennazar-Zequeira

Attorney at Bennezar, Garcia & Millan, CSP

P.O. Box 194000 #212

San Juan, PR 00919-4000

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #5

Exhibit CATEGORY SHEET

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover SHEET

1 #3

Summons Summons PRASA

1 #2

Exhibit Certified Mail receipts

1 #1

Exhibit 60 day letter

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/16/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority filed by Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority filed by Edelmiro Antonio Salas-Gonzalez on behalf of Natalia Cebollero-Bertran Responses due by 7/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Salas-Gonzalez, Edelmiro) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority filed by Jorge Marrero-Narvaez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Narvaez, Jorge) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Clarify #8 Extension of time until June 21, 2019 to to plead filed by Jorge Marrero-Narvaez on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 6/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Narvaez, Jorge) Modified event and title on 6/3/2019 (idg). (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time until May 31, 2019 to File Answer filed by Jorge Marrero-Narvaez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Narvaez, Jorge) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Ramirez-Isern on behalf of Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority (Ramirez-Isern, Carlos) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of PRASA and Request for an Extension of Time to Plead by A. J. Bennazar-Zequeira on behalf of Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority (Bennazar-Zequeira, A.) Modified to add event on 5/21/2019 (idg). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jose L. Ramirez-de-Leon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-de-Leon, Jose) Modified title on 5/6/2019 (idg). (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natalia Cebollero-Bertran upon Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Salas-Gonzalez, Edelmiro) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6382128.), filed by Natalia Cebollero-Bertran. Service due by 7/29/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 60 day letter, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail receipts, #3 Summons Summons PRASA, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover SHEET, #5 Exhibit CATEGORY SHEET)(Salas-Gonzalez, Edelmiro) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority is a litigant