This case was last updated from PACER on 03/04/2020 at 07:04:07 (UTC).

Ceasar v. Kroger Lake Charles et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2020 Ceasar filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kroger Lake Charles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and S Maurice Hicks, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

**Sanctioned/Barred* R Ceasar

Opelousas, LA 70571

Defendants

Certegy

Kroger Lake Charles

Kroger Store Manager

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis

#7

(#7) FEE LETTER requesting payment of appeal filing fee sent to R Ceasar re #6 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) by R Ceasar. FEE STATUS: NOT PAID (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff R Ceasar's #1 Complaint be stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/13/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #3 Memorandum Order, Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff pay fees and costs owed in 6:04-CV-00391 totaling $14,498.62 as well as the filing fees of $400.00 in this case within 30 days. Failure to pay the fees and costs will result in the complaint being stricken from the record and this case closed.Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/8/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kroger(Certegy Manager), Kroger with Jury Demand filed by R Ceasar. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA Case Number 20-30119 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by R Ceasar. (crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FEE LETTER requesting payment of appeal filing fee sent to R Ceasar re #6 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) by R Ceasar. FEE STATUS: NOT PAID (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff R Ceasar's #1 Complaint be stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/13/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #3 Memorandum Order, Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff pay fees and costs owed in 6:04-CV-00391 totaling $14,498.62 as well as the filing fees of $400.00 in this case within 30 days. Failure to pay the fees and costs will result in the complaint being stricken from the record and this case closed.Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/8/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 2:20-cv-0016 from Lake Charles Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:20-cv-0016. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kroger(Certegy Manager), Kroger with Jury Demand filed by R Ceasar. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Store #156 is a litigant