This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2019 at 07:29:00 (UTC).

CBRE Inc. v. Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 CBRE Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-61235

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CBRE Inc.

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3200, Miami

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant

Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc.

7605 Davie Road Ext.

Davie, FL 33024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Stephen Boos

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3200

Miami, FL 33131

John D. Garretson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Mark D. Schafer

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Permanent Injunction

15 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Default Judgment

15 #1

Affidavit of Mark D. Schafer

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #3

Text of Proposed Order Granting CBRE's Motion for Preliminary Injunction

10 #2

Affidavit of Mark D Schafer (with incorporated exhibits)

10 #1

Affidavit of Scott Correale (with incorporated exhibits)

#10

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

1 #6

Exhibit D

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by CBRE Inc. re #14 Order of Requirements, Notice of Service of Court Filings (Boos, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Default Judgment Against Capital Commercial Real Estate Group by CBRE Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark D. Schafer, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Permanent Injunction)(Boos, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Plaintiff shall file either a Motion for Default Final Judgment or a Notice of Joint Liability on or before July 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mhn) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerks Entry of Default as to Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc. - Motions Terminated: #12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/25/2019. (pes) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc. by CBRE Inc.. (Boos, Eric) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Capital Commercial Real Estate Group by CBRE Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott Correale (with incorporated exhibits), #2 Affidavit of Mark D Schafer (with incorporated exhibits), #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting CBRE's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Boos, Eric) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) John D. Garretson. All future notices of electronic filings through CM/ECF shall be emailed to jgarretson@shb.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/10/2019. (mhn) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Mark D. Schafer. All future notices of electronic filings through CM/ECF shall be emailed to mschafer@shb.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/10/2019. (mhn) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John D. Garretson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11704273 by CBRE Inc.. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boos, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark D. Schafer. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11704222 by CBRE Inc.. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boos, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CBRE Inc.. Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Boos, Eric) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc.. (jao) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11649479, filed by CBRE Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Boos, Eric) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital Commercial Real Estate Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CBRE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Schafer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Stephen Boos