This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 13:37:34 (UTC).

CB Marine Towing & Salvage, Inc v. IBMO, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 CB Marine Towing Salvage, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against IBMO, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are K. Michael Moore and Lauren Fleischer Louis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21463

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

K. Michael Moore

Referral Judge

Lauren Fleischer Louis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CB Marine Towing & Salvage Inc. doing business as Sea Tow Miami

Defendants

IBMO LLC

M/Y C'EST LA VIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew John Valcourt

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

600 Brickell Ave, Suite 1400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CB Marine Towing & Salvage Inc.. IBMO LLC served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021; M/Y C'EST LA VIE served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Valcourt, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Action/Publication filed by CB Marine Towing & Salvage Inc.. All Defendants. (Valcourt, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CB Marine Towing & Salvage Inc.. IBMO LLC served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021; M/Y C'EST LA VIE served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Valcourt, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Action/Publication filed by CB Marine Towing & Salvage Inc.. All Defendants. (Valcourt, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN FLEISCHER LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis' discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/16/2021. (thn) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/16/2021. (thn) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition (Complaint) to Enforce Arbitration Award in rem and in personam Arbitration. Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14610502, filed by CB Marine Towing & Salvage d/b/a Sea Tow Miami. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit B-MARSALV Agreement, #4 Exhibit C-Demand for Arbitration, #5 Exhibit D-Affidavit Cestari, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Confirming Award and Judgment)(Valcourt, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew John Valcourt