This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2023 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

Cazaubon et al v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 Cazaubon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alison Cazaubon

Daniel Cazaubon, III

Jerome Cazaubon

Defendants

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank Dean Ippolito

Defendant Attorneys

Louis Matthew Grossman

Anne Cary Lemelin

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 835-487 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9757958) filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Anne Cary Lemelin added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lemelin, Anne) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/19/2023) (mmm). (Entered: 01/19/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Lemelin, Anne) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#4

(#4) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(js) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#5

(#5) Notice of Compliance by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lemelin, Anne) Modified text/link on 1/27/2023 (js). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit A

5 #2

Exhibit B

#6

(#6) First MOTION for More Definite Statement by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Lemelin, Anne) Modified text/referral on 1/27/2023 (js). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

#7

(#7) ORDER AND REASONS denying #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 3/1/2023. (cwa) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 03/15/2023. (js) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossman, Louis) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER AND REASONS denying #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 3/1/2023. (cwa) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for More Definite Statement by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Lemelin, Anne) Modified text/referral on 1/27/2023 (js). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lemelin, Anne) Modified text/link on 1/27/2023 (js). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(js) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Lemelin, Anne) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 835-487 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9757958) filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Anne Cary Lemelin added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lemelin, Anne) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/19/2023) (mmm). (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less