Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:27:31 (UTC).

Cazares et al v. Ortho El Paso, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Cazares filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ortho El Paso, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip R. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip R. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Javier Cadena Cazares

Angelina Cazares

Defendants

Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc.

Genzyme Biosurgery

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi Pasteur

Sanofi Genzyme

Aventis Inc.

Ortho El Paso, P.A.

Sanofi SA

CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS

Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc.

CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS

Sanofi-Aventis

Genzyme Corporation

Sanofi U.S.

Sanofi-Aventis LLC

Genco Pharmaceutical Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell A. Murray

Attorney at Lovett Law Firm

519 Arizona Ave.

El Paso, TX 79902

Robert Leon Lovett

Attorney at Lovett Law Firm

619 Arizona

El Paso, TX 79902

Defendant Attorneys

Valerie Renee Auger

Attorney at Mann Morrow, PLLC

671 South Mesa Hills, Suite A-1

El Paso, TX 79912

John Scott Mann

Attorney at Mann Morrow, PLLC

671 S. Mesa Hills Drive, Suite A-1

El Paso, TX 79912

Paul M. Bracken

Attorney at Robles, Bracken & Hughes

310 N. Mesa, Suite 700

El Paso, TX 79901-1364

Mark A. Bracken

Attorney at Robles, Bracken & Hughes

310 N. Mesa, Suite 700

El Paso, TX 79901

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 1/4/2021 09:00AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, Jury Trial set for 4/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, ADR Report Deadline due by 3/26/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2020, Discovery due by 8/26/2020, Motions due by 9/28/2020,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Ortho El Paso, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#9

(#9) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Revised in Accordance with Court's February 18, 2020, Order Requiring Amended Joint Case Management Report [ECF No. 8] by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by no later than February 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#7) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Javier Cadena Cazares (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Genco Pharmaceutical Services, Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#5

(#5) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan of the Parties by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Genco Pharmaceutical Services, Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by Javier Cadena Cazares. (Serta, Adam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report. Plaintiff and Defendant Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report due by 2/11/2020,Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER TO REPELAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A Part 3

1 #2

Exhibit A Part 2

1 #1

Exhibit A Part 1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 1/4/2021 09:00AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, Jury Trial set for 4/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, ADR Report Deadline due by 3/26/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2020, Discovery due by 8/26/2020, Motions due by 9/28/2020,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Ortho El Paso, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Revised in Accordance with Court's February 18, 2020, Order Requiring Amended Joint Case Management Report [ECF No. 8] by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by no later than February 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Javier Cadena Cazares (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Genco Pharmaceutical Services, Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan of the Parties by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Genco Pharmaceutical Services, Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand by Javier Cadena Cazares. (Serta, Adam) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report. Plaintiff and Defendant Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report due by 2/11/2020,Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER TO REPELAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13048731), filed by Sanofi-Aventis, Aventis Inc., Genzyme Corporation, Genzyme Biosurgery, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi SA, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sanofi U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(mn) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (mn) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Genzyme Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS/CAREMARK RHODE ISLAND CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant