This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 12:01:21 (UTC).

CAYLOR v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 CAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS, MICHAEL J FRANK and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judges

MICHAEL J FRANK

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID LEE CAYLOR

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD L NATIONS

Attorney at HOWARD L NATIONS PC - HOUSTON TX

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042-3795

PATRICK RUSSELL KIRBY

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM - HOUSTON TX

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

SARAH A LONG

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

16 #1

April 15, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Patrick Russell Kirby

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK RUSSELL KIRBY on behalf of DAVID LEE CAYLOR (Attachments: #1 April 15, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Patrick Russell Kirby) (KIRBY, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv87-MCR/GRJ. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

14 #1

April 9, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD L NATIONS on behalf of DAVID LEE CAYLOR (Attachments: #1 April 9, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations) (NATIONS, HOWARD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel. Added attorney SARAH A LONG,JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY and BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/8/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#10

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record. (sdw) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#27

(#17) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Lists of all BELO cases pending in this district as of April 19, 2019 are attached as Exhibits A, B, and C. The Clerk is directed to add all plaintiff and defense counsel of record to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/29/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 12/27/2018)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 12/27/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-00963-MCR-GRJ. (djb) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-00963-MCR-GRJ. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Lists of all BELO cases pending in this district as of April 19, 2019 are attached as Exhibits A, B, and C. The Clerk is directed to add all plaintiff and defense counsel of record to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK RUSSELL KIRBY on behalf of DAVID LEE CAYLOR (Attachments: #1 April 15, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Patrick Russell Kirby) (KIRBY, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 5:19cv87-MCR/GRJ. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD L NATIONS on behalf of DAVID LEE CAYLOR (Attachments: #1 April 9, 2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations) (NATIONS, HOWARD) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel. Added attorney SARAH A LONG,JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY and BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/8/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record. (sdw) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (mailed via USPS to CATHERINE MCELDOWNEY, DON HAYCRAFT, KEVIN HODGES, NATIONS LAW FIRM, and GEORGIA LUCIER) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to CATHERINE MCELDOWNEY, DON HAYCRAFT, KEVIN HODGES, NATIONS LAW FIRM, and GEORGIA LUCIER) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-11599. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/29/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7258972) filed by David Lee Caylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party David Lee Caylor(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/29/2019.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less