This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 08:03:21 (UTC).

Cavazos v. Walmart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Cavazos filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando Rodriguez, Jr and Ronald G Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando Rodriguez, Jr

Referral Judge

Ronald G Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Javier Cavazos

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Murphy Oil USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ezequiel Reyna, Jr

Attorney at Attorney at Law

702 W Expressway 83, Ste 100

Weslaco, TX 78596

Richard Nicholas Moore

Attorney at Law Offices of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., P.C.

702 W Expressway 83, Suite 100

Weslaco, TX 78596

Defendant Attorneys

Rafael Garcia, Jr

Attorney at Thornton Biechlin et al

418 E Dove

Mcallen, TX 78504

Patrick Wolter

Attorney at Donnell Kieschnick Wolter & Gamez

555 N Carancahua, Suite 400

Corpus Christi, TX 78414

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Index of Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Docket Sheet and Documents

1 #3

Exhibit Ntc to Plf of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit Ntc to State Court of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Counsel of Record

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Stricken per Order #5 NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Javier Cavazos, filed. (Moore, Richard) Modified on 6/10/2022 (EfrainGarcia, 1). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED ORDER Granting re: #3 Notice (Other), filed.(Moore, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER striking #3 Notice (Other). If the Plaintiff wishes to dismiss this case, he can either file a stipulationunder Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or a motion to dismiss.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(EfrainGarcia, 1) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., filed.(Wolter, Patrick) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart, Inc., filed.(Garcia, Rafael) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Javier Cavazos, filed.(Moore, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Javier Cavazos, filed.(Moore, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart, Inc., filed.(Garcia, Rafael) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., filed.(Wolter, Patrick) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER striking #3 Notice (Other). If the Plaintiff wishes to dismiss this case, he can either file a stipulationunder Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or a motion to dismiss.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(EfrainGarcia, 1) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED ORDER Granting re: #3 Notice (Other), filed.(Moore, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Stricken per Order #5 NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Javier Cavazos, filed. (Moore, Richard) Modified on 6/10/2022 (EfrainGarcia, 1). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 107th Cameron County, case number 2022-DCL-2113 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28271465) filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet and Documents, #3 Exhibit Ntc to Plf of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ntc to State Court of Removal, #5 Exhibit Counsel of Record)(Wolter, Patrick) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rafael Garcia, Jr