Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 07:22:18 (UTC).

Cavalier v. SPEEDWAY, LLC.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Cavalier filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SPEEDWAY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03883

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Cavalier

Defendant

SPEEDWAY, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andre Paul Gaston

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Andre P. Gaston

2 Mid America Plaza, Suite 800

Oakbrook Terrace, IL 60181

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jeffrey Cavalier. SPEEDWAY, LLC. waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Jeffrey Cavalier re amended complaint #5 (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#5

(#5) First Amended AMENDED complaint by Jeffrey Cavalier against SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 9/2/2020 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffrey Cavalier by Andre Paul Gaston (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Cavalier; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17167427.(Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jeffrey Cavalier. SPEEDWAY, LLC. waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Jeffrey Cavalier re amended complaint #5 (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First Amended AMENDED complaint by Jeffrey Cavalier against SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 9/2/2020 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffrey Cavalier by Andre Paul Gaston (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Cavalier; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17167427.(Gaston, Andre) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPEEDWAY LLC is a litigant