This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:50:33 (UTC).

Caudle v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Caudle filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Corrections Rehabilitation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda Lopez and Janis L. Sammartino. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda Lopez

Presiding Judge

Janis L. Sammartino

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Edward Caudle

Stockton, CA 95215

Defendants

Correctional Officer Romero, -

California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation

E. Frijas

Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Complaint,. Mail sent to Ronald Edward Caudle. (bta) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Edward Caudle. (jms) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald Edward Caudle (jms) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER (1) Granting #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Dismissing Defendants CDCR, RJD, and Frijas pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b)(1); and (3) Directing U.S. Marshall to effect service upon Defendant Romero pursuan to 28 USC 1915(d) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). (Summons and IFP package prepared). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/10/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility, E. Frijas, Romero, filed by Ronald Edward Caudle. ($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-98-JLS-LL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: #1 in forma pauperis letter)(jpp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

6 #1

in forma pauperis letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: #1 in forma pauperis letter)(jpp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER (1) Granting #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Dismissing Defendants CDCR, RJD, and Frijas pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b)(1); and (3) Directing U.S. Marshall to effect service upon Defendant Romero pursuan to 28 USC 1915(d) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). (Summons and IFP package prepared). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/10/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald Edward Caudle (jms) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Complaint,. Mail sent to Ronald Edward Caudle. (bta) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Edward Caudle. (jms) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility, E. Frijas, Romero, filed by Ronald Edward Caudle. ($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-98-JLS-LL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.