This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2022 at 09:53:43 (UTC).

CAUDILLO, et al v ADVANCE SERVICES INC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 CAUDILLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ADVANCE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carlos Alberto Caudillo

Alexis Alejandro Caudillo

Cinthia Caudillo Pina

Carla Caudillo

Juan Luis Caudillo

Jose Rolando Caudillo

Angel Adelardo Caudillo

Osmara Yoselyn Caudillo

Maria Elva Caudillo

Roberto Castro

FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, SR

CARLOS A. CAUDILLO JR.

Defendants

ADVANCE SERVICES INC

CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC

PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAWSON MORTON

Attorney at Dawson Morton, LLC

1003 Freedom Blvd

Watsonville, CA 95816

WILLIAM JOSEPH GRIGG

1206 E Van Buren St

Brownsville, TX 78520

ERIN SIDONIA MITCHELL

30 S Texas Blvd

Weslaco, TX 78596

Defendant Attorneys

BRIAN H SANCHEZ

333 West Wacker Drive, Ste 500

Chicago, IL 60606

MEGAN MATHEWS NOBLE

303 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3500

Atlanta, GA 30308

FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV

1604 W 3Rd Ave

Albany, GA 31707

YIFAN SANCHEZ

333 West Wacker Dr, Ste 500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Required Form

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition, by CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC, PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC (NOBLE, MEGAN) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#21

(#21) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by YIFAN SANCHEZ (tam) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

20 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by JOSE ROLANDO CAUDILLO, ROBERTO CASTRO, CINTHIA CAUDILLO PINA, ANGEL ADELARDO CAUDILLO, MARIA ELVA CAUDILLO, ALEXIS ALEJANDRO CAUDILLO, OSMARA YOSELYN CAUDILLO, CARLA CAUDILLO, CARLOS ALBERTO CAUDILLO, FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, SR, JUAN LUIS CAUDILLO, CARLOS A. CAUDILLO JR. (GRIGG, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV on behalf of CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC, PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC Attorney FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV added to party CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC(pty:dft), Attorney FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV added to party PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC(pty:dft)(COLEMAN, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC identifying Corporate Parent EI DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, Corporate Parent CORTEVA INC for PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC. (NOBLE, MEGAN) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to ADVANCE SERVICES INC. (sbd) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ERIN SIDONIA MITCHELL (tam) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

4 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing - SDTX

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by WILLIAM JOSEPH GRIGG (tam) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

2 #1

Certificate of Good Standing William J. Grigg's Certificate of Good Standin

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/29/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #22 Stipulation filed by PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC, CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC ); Notice to Counsel Megan Noble. The e mail address on the document does not match your e mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER.(bcl) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead re #19 Amended Complaint/Petition, by CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC, PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC (NOBLE, MEGAN) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by YIFAN SANCHEZ (tam) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #20 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC, CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC ); For future filings all documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. NO NEED TO REFILE(tam) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC, PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4125417, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Megan Mathews Noble Georgia Bar No. 477009. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SANCHEZ, YIFAN) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED #1 Complaint against All Defendants by JOSE ROLANDO CAUDILLO, ROBERTO CASTRO, CINTHIA CAUDILLO PINA, ANGEL ADELARDO CAUDILLO, MARIA ELVA CAUDILLO, ALEXIS ALEJANDRO CAUDILLO, OSMARA YOSELYN CAUDILLO, CARLA CAUDILLO, CARLOS ALBERTO CAUDILLO, FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, SR, JUAN LUIS CAUDILLO, CARLOS A. CAUDILLO JR. (GRIGG, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV on behalf of CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC, PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC Attorney FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV added to party CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC(pty:dft), Attorney FRANKLIN T COLEMAN, IV added to party PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC(pty:dft)(COLEMAN, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC identifying Corporate Parent EI DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, Corporate Parent CORTEVA INC for PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC. (NOBLE, MEGAN) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC identifying Corporate Parent PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC, Corporate Parent MYCOGEN LLC, Corporate Parent CENTEN AG LLC, Corporate Parent DDP AGROSCIENCES US DCOMCO INC, Corporate Parent EI DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, Corporate Parent CORTEVA INC for CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC. (NOBLE, MEGAN) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by JOSE ROLANDO CAUDILLO, CINTHIA CAUDILLO PINA, CARLA CAUDILLO, OSMARA YOSELYN CAUDILLO, JUAN LUIS CAUDILLO, FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, SR, CARLOS ALBERTO CAUDILLO, ALEXIS ALEJANDRO CAUDILLO, ROBERTO CASTRO, MARIA ELVA CAUDILLO, ANGEL ADELARDO CAUDILLO ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(sbd) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL INC. (sbd) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CORTEVA AGRI-SCIENCE INC. (sbd) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to ADVANCE SERVICES INC. (sbd) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ERIN SIDONIA MITCHELL (tam) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4102483, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Dawson Morton, Georgia Bar No. 525985. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing - SDTX)(MITCHELL, ERIN) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by WILLIAM JOSEPH GRIGG (tam) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4101529, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Dawson Morton Georgia Bar No. 525985. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing William J. Grigg's Certificate of Good Standing from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas)(GRIGG, WILLIAM) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL - William J. Griff and E. Sidonia Mitchell - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements.(sbd) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # CGAMDC-4099539, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORTON, DAWSON) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corteva Agriscience LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LB & JB INC; DBA : ADVANCE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Franklin T. Coleman IV