This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:10:42 (UTC).

Caudill v. Winnebago County States Attorney Office et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Caudill filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Winnebago County States Attorney Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa A. Jensen and Philip G. Reinhard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50307

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chris Caudill

Vienna, IL 62995

Respondent

Winnebago County States Attorney Office

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Envelope

1 #3

Exhibit

#4

(#4) APPLICATION by Petitioner Chris Caudill for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Petition for writ of mandamus by Petitioner Chris Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (jp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #3 Exhibit) (jp, ). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) ORDER: The court's November 21, 2019 order directed petitioner Chris Caudill to resolve the court's filing fee requirement by either prepaying the $400 fee or submitting a completed in forma pauperis application. Petitioner was given until December 20, 2019 to comply. The court advised that failure to comply would result in summary dismissal of this case, which seeks a writ of mandamus to enforce the Interstate Agreement on Detainers, 18 U.S.C. App. 2 2. The court's prior order explained that the Interstate Agreement did not appear to apply to petitioner's case. The court has received neither payment of the filing fee, nor a completed in forma pauperis application since its November 21, 2019 order, and it appears petitioner no longer seeks to pursue this action. Accordingly, this case is dismissed. See N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.3(f); FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1891 (2016) (it "has long [been] recognized that a district court possesses inherent powers... to manage [its] own affairs so as to achieve the orderly and expeditious disposition of cases"). Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/6/2020:notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Petitioner Chris Caudill for Leave to File Petition of Mandamus. (jp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/6/2020: Mailed notice (sb, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) #4 is denied without prejudice to him either (1) prepaying the $400 filing fee or (2) submitting a completed IFP application on this court's form with a certificate section completed by an authorized officer and a copy of his prison trust account for the six-month period before he filed this action. Petitioner has until December 20, 2019 to comply, and his failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall send to petitioner a blank IFP form. Petitioner's motion for leave to file a mandamus petition #3 is denied as unnecessary. If petitioner resolves the filing fee, the court will then address the mandamus petition, which asks this court to compel enforcement of the Interstate Agreement on Detainers, 18 U.S.C. APP. 2 2, in his state court proceedings. Before deciding to proceed with this case, petitioner should consider both: (1) federal courts cannot issue a mandamus "to a state judicial officer to control or interfere with state court litigation, thus exceeding our jurisdiction." In re Campbell, 264 F.3d 730, 731 (7th Cir. 2001); see also Bradley v. Lawrence, No. 18-CV-02169, 2019 WL 4204328, at *1 (S.D. Ill. Sept. 5, 2019) (explaining that federal writs of mandamus are for federal, not state, officers and employees), and (2) the Interstate Agreement is for detainers sought by officials of one state on an inmate in another state, and does not govern detainers sought by officials on inmates within the same state. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 11/21/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/6/2020: Mailed notice (sb, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: The court's November 21, 2019 order directed petitioner Chris Caudill to resolve the court's filing fee requirement by either prepaying the $400 fee or submitting a completed in forma pauperis application. Petitioner was given until December 20, 2019 to comply. The court advised that failure to comply would result in summary dismissal of this case, which seeks a writ of mandamus to enforce the Interstate Agreement on Detainers, 18 U.S.C. App. 2 2. The court's prior order explained that the Interstate Agreement did not appear to apply to petitioner's case. The court has received neither payment of the filing fee, nor a completed in forma pauperis application since its November 21, 2019 order, and it appears petitioner no longer seeks to pursue this action. Accordingly, this case is dismissed. See N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.3(f); FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1891 (2016) (it "has long [been] recognized that a district court possesses inherent powers... to manage [its] own affairs so as to achieve the orderly and expeditious disposition of cases"). Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/6/2020:notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) #4 is denied without prejudice to him either (1) prepaying the $400 filing fee or (2) submitting a completed IFP application on this court's form with a certificate section completed by an authorized officer and a copy of his prison trust account for the six-month period before he filed this action. Petitioner has until December 20, 2019 to comply, and his failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall send to petitioner a blank IFP form. Petitioner's motion for leave to file a mandamus petition #3 is denied as unnecessary. If petitioner resolves the filing fee, the court will then address the mandamus petition, which asks this court to compel enforcement of the Interstate Agreement on Detainers, 18 U.S.C. APP. 2 2, in his state court proceedings. Before deciding to proceed with this case, petitioner should consider both: (1) federal courts cannot issue a mandamus "to a state judicial officer to control or interfere with state court litigation, thus exceeding our jurisdiction." In re Campbell, 264 F.3d 730, 731 (7th Cir. 2001); see also Bradley v. Lawrence, No. 18-CV-02169, 2019 WL 4204328, at *1 (S.D. Ill. Sept. 5, 2019) (explaining that federal writs of mandamus are for federal, not state, officers and employees), and (2) the Interstate Agreement is for detainers sought by officials of one state on an inmate in another state, and does not govern detainers sought by officials on inmates within the same state. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 11/21/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION by Petitioner Chris Caudill for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION by Petitioner Chris Caudill for Leave to File Petition of Mandamus. (jp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jp, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Petition for writ of mandamus by Petitioner Chris Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (jp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #3 Exhibit) (jp, ). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.