This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2022 at 07:52:03 (UTC).

Cathy v. Palma et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Cathy filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Palma. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Jill L. Burkhardt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01565

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Ray Cathy

Defendants

Palma

Morales

V. Dorsey

A. Amat

E. Uribe

J. Angulo

Alvarez

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit G

#2

(#2) MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fees from his Prison Trust Account by Charles Ray Cathy. (smy1) Modified on 10/12/2022 to correct motion designation (smy1). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for US Marshal Service by Charles Ray Cathy. (smy1) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid. Receipt number CAS141401, Paid on 10/25/2022 (smy1) . (Entered: 10/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid. Receipt number CAS141401, Paid on 10/25/2022 (smy1) . (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for US Marshal Service by Charles Ray Cathy. (smy1) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fees from his Prison Trust Account by Charles Ray Cathy. (smy1) Modified on 10/12/2022 to correct motion designation (smy1). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alvarez, Amat, Angulo, Dorsey, Morales, Palmer, Urige (Filing fee $402, fee not paid, IFP filed.), filed by Charles Ray Cathy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1565-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (smy1) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/31/2022 to extract Motion) (smy1). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less