This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 11:39:04 (UTC).

Cathexis Ventures, LP et al v. mIQroTech, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On December 3, 2021, Cathexis Ventures, LP (“Cathexis”), Joaquin Alex Fernandez (“Fernandez”), Thomas Alex Newton, Jr. (“Newton”), Page Angel Investors II, LLC (“Page Angel Investors”), George Laflin (“Laflin”), and others (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) represented by James Nial Robinson II of White & Case LLP, filed a personal property fraud lawsuit against mIQroTech, Inc. and Meade Lewis (“Defendants”) seeking damages and costs, along with prejudgment and post-judgment interest, among other relief for alleged fraud and negligence perpetrated by Defendants. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Middle District of Florida with Judges Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Thomas G. Wilson presiding.

 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that, “Between 2020 and 2021, Meade Lewis, the founder, Chief Executive Officer, director, and majority shareholder of mIQroTech—a technology start-up in the oil and gas industry—fraudulently raised millions of dollars from Plaintiffs Cathexis, Fernandez, Newton, Page Angel Investors, Minor, We Hang, and ShaDaySha (together, the “Series A Investors”) by making false and misleading statements about the Company’s business. Specifically, Lewis and mIQroTech misled the Series A Investors by making false statements regarding the Company’s financial performance, the number of customers the Company had, the existence of an additional marquee investor, and the extent to which mIQroTech’s product was developed and deployed in the field.”

 

Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Defendants made these false and misleading statements in written materials provided to investors and in oral communications that Lewis had with the Series A Investors, which the Series A Investors relied on when they invested millions of dollars in the Company” and “Among other things, as part of Defendants’ marketing and solicitation efforts to get the Series A Investors to invest in the Company, Defendants provided the Series A Investors with pitch decks and purported financial information about the Company filled with false representations and misleading statements.”

 

Plaintiffs also alleged that, “In reliance on these materials and Defendants’ other representations, the Series A Investors ultimately invested over $7 million in the Company and collectively acquired an ownership stake that was represented by Defendants to be approximately 17% in the Company” and “Defendants have committed fraud and negligent misrepresentation, and the Company has breached the Series A Preferred Stock Purchase Agreement (the “Purchase Agreement”) and Investors’ Rights Agreement (the “Investors’ Rights Agreement”), both dated November 30, 2020, that the Company entered into with the Series A Investors.”

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by Plaintiffs. The first claim is for the alleged fraud by mIQroTech and Lewis. The second claim is for the alleged negligent misrepresentation by mIQroTech and Lewis. The third claim is for the alleged breach of the purchase agreement by mIQroTech. The fourth claim is for the alleged breach of the investors’ rights agreement by mIQroTech. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs requested the court actual damages, incidental damages, consequential damages, lost profits, lost goodwill, punitive damages, and other costs and damages along with attorneys’ fees, costs, and expenses incurred in connection with this litigation. Further, Plaintiff requested the court for prejudgement and post-judgement interest along with any other relief the court deems just and proper with costs and expenses for this action.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02823

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judge

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cathexis Ventures, LP

Joaquin Alex Fernandez

Thomas Alex Newton, Jr.

Page Angel Investors II, LLC

George Laflin

Kevin Minor

We Hang, GP

ShaDaySha, LLC

Defendants

mIQroTech, Inc.

Meade Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wyatt R. Smith

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Gregory Starner

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Jackson Herndon

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-2787

Zachary Brian Dickens

Attorney at White & Case

200 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

James Nial Robinson, II

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Lockamy

Attorney at Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, PA

The Bedell Bldg101 E Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Scott W. Atherton

Attorney at Atherton McAuliffe & Reeder

224 Datura St, Suite 815

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-5636

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Meade Lewis. (Atherton, Scott) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

#15

(#15) RETURN of service executed on December 6, 2021 by Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, We Hang, GP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, ShaDaySha, LLC, Cathexis Ventures, LP, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, George Laflin as to Meade Lewis. (Starner, Gregory) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#14

(#14) RETURN of service executed on December 7, 2021 by Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, We Hang, GP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, ShaDaySha, LLC, Cathexis Ventures, LP, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, George Laflin as to mIQroTech, Inc. (Starner, Gregory) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Wyatt R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for Jackson Herndon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Gregory Starner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#10

(#10) STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/7/2021. (EDB) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Meade Lewis and mIQroTech, Inc. (JLD) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

7 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Defendant Lewis's #17 unopposed motion for extension of time. Lewis must respond to the Complaint on or before January 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/25/2021. (EDB) (Entered: 12/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Defendant Miqrotech, Inc.'s #16 unopposed motion for extension of time. Miqrotech must respond to the Complaint on or before January 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/25/2021. (EDB) (Entered: 12/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Meade Lewis. (Atherton, Scott) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by mIQroTech, Inc.. (Lockamy, Michael) (Entered: 12/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN of service executed on December 6, 2021 by Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, We Hang, GP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, ShaDaySha, LLC, Cathexis Ventures, LP, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, George Laflin as to Meade Lewis. (Starner, Gregory) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN of service executed on December 7, 2021 by Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, We Hang, GP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, ShaDaySha, LLC, Cathexis Ventures, LP, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, George Laflin as to mIQroTech, Inc. (Starner, Gregory) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Wyatt R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for Jackson Herndon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Gregory Starner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/7/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/7/2021. (EDB) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Meade Lewis and mIQroTech, Inc. (JLD) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#6) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2823-KKM-TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Wyatt R. Smith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18992507 for $150 by Cathexis Ventures, LP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, George Laflin, Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, ShaDaySha, LLC, We Hang, GP. (Robinson, James) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Jackson Herndon to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18992506 for $150 by Cathexis Ventures, LP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, George Laflin, Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, ShaDaySha, LLC, We Hang, GP. (Robinson, James) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Gregory Starner to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18992505 for $150 by Cathexis Ventures, LP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, George Laflin, Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, ShaDaySha, LLC, We Hang, GP. (Robinson, James) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement (Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03), by Cathexis Ventures, LP, Joaquin Alex Fernandez, George Laflin, Kevin Minor, Thomas Alex Newton, Jr, Page Angel Investors II, LLC, ShaDaySha, LLC, We Hang, GP. (Robinson, James) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18992468) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - mIQroTech, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons - Meade Lewis)(Robinson, James) Modified text on 12/6/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott W. Atherton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael E. Lockamy