This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 07:19:55 (UTC).

Cathal Watters v. United Recovery Systems, LP

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Cathal Watters filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against United Recovery Systems, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03807

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cathal Watters

Defendant

United Recovery Systems, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Thomas Martin, III

Attorney at Martin and Bontrager APC

4605 Lankershim Boulevard Suite 535

Toluca Lake, CA 91602

Nicholas J Bontrager

Attorney at Martin and Bontrager APC

4605 Lankershim Boulevard Suite 535

Toluca Lake, CA 91602

Defendant Attorneys

James K Schultz

Attorney at Sessions Israel and Shartle LLP

1545 Hotel Circle South Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92108

Brittany Lyn Shaw

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan and Israel

1545 Hotel Circle South Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92108-3426

Debbie P Kirkpatrick

Attorney at Sessions Israel and Shartle LLP

1545 Hotel Circle South Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The parties filed a notice of settlement on June 25, 2021 #11 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are to show cause why the action should not be dismissed with prejudice on August 27, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. If the parties file a proposed order to dismiss the entire action with prejudice by August 20, 2021, the OSC shall be taken off calendar without further notice. Otherwise, the parties shall file a status conference report by August 20, 2021 and appear at the OSC hearing even if they subsequently file a request for dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other hearings and deadlines are vacated. (lom) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement Cathal Watters. (Martin, George) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Recovery Systems, LP answer now due 6/25/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United Recovery Systems, LP.(Attorney Brittany Lyn Shaw added to party United Recovery Systems, LP(pty:dft))(Shaw, Brittany) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#8

(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant United Recovery Systems, LP. (esa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties (Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cathal Watters. (Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Cathal Watters. (Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31239182 - Fee: $402. (Attorney George Thomas Martin, III added to party Cathal Watters(pty:pla))(Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The parties filed a notice of settlement on June 25, 2021 #11 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are to show cause why the action should not be dismissed with prejudice on August 27, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. If the parties file a proposed order to dismiss the entire action with prejudice by August 20, 2021, the OSC shall be taken off calendar without further notice. Otherwise, the parties shall file a status conference report by August 20, 2021 and appear at the OSC hearing even if they subsequently file a request for dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other hearings and deadlines are vacated. (lom) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement Cathal Watters. (Martin, George) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: The parties are advised that the Court has updated its standing orders effective June 15, 2021 (i.e., Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., Mandatory Scheduling Conference (MSC) Order, Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment, Pretrial and Trial Order). These orders apply to all pending cases, except as follows: (1) the updated Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment (MSJ) does not apply to any MSJ filed on or before July 27, 2021; and (2) the updated Pretrial and Trial Order does not apply to any case with a pretrial conference set on or before July 22, 2021. The parties are directed to read and comply with all these standing orders except as noted in the prior sentence. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Recovery Systems, LP answer now due 6/25/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United Recovery Systems, LP.(Attorney Brittany Lyn Shaw added to party United Recovery Systems, LP(pty:dft))(Shaw, Brittany) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant United Recovery Systems, LP. (esa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties (Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cathal Watters. (Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Cathal Watters. (Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31239182 - Fee: $402. (Attorney George Thomas Martin, III added to party Cathal Watters(pty:pla))(Martin, George) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED RECOVERY SYSTEMS LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debbie P Kirkpatrick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Lyn Shaw

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James K. Schultz