Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 07:07:57 (UTC).

Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Timber Hill Farm LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Timber Hill Farm LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet C. Hall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01929

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet C. Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation

Defendants

Timber Hill Farm LLC

Barbara Gaydosh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen J. Riccardulli

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

640 Fifth Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10019-6102

Defendant Attorney

David V. DeRosa

Attorney at Law Offices of David V. DeRosa

42 Terrace Avenue, P.O. Box 992

Naugatuck, CT 06770

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) WRIT of Replevin Returned Unexecuted (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#45

(#45) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #44 Default Judgment (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#44

(#44) ORDER granting #42 Motion for Default Judgment. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation against Timber Hill Farm LLC, Barbara Gaydosh. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#43

(#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #42 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timber Hill Farm LLC and Barbara Gaydosh (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

42 #2

Proposed Order

42 #1

Exhibit A - Affirmation of Riccardulli

#42

(#42) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timber Hill Farm LLC and Barbara Gaydosh by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affirmation of Riccardulli, #2 Proposed Order)(Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

37 #2

Exhibit B - Proof of Service Timber Hill

37 #1

Exhibit A - Proof of Service Gaydosh

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Barbara Gaydosh, Timber Hill Farm LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen J. Riccardulli* *Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC* *640 Fifth Avenue, 9th Floor* *New York, NY 10019-6102*. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-G

#1

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) WRIT of Replevin Returned Unexecuted (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #44 Default Judgment (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER granting #42 Motion for Default Judgment. DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation against Timber Hill Farm LLC, Barbara Gaydosh. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2020. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #42 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timber Hill Farm LLC and Barbara Gaydosh (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timber Hill Farm LLC and Barbara Gaydosh by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affirmation of Riccardulli, #2 Proposed Order)(Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER: Treating #37 Motion for Default Judgment as a Motion for Default Entry 55(a), it is granted. Motion for default judgment due by 9/10 /2020. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/11/2020. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) First NOTICE by Barbara Gaydosh, Timber Hill Farm LLC re 36 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,, (DeRosa, David) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#39) ORDER: As stated in the courts Order, Doc. 36 dated 7/8/2020, Attorney David DeRosa is directed to file proof of service that the courts Order terminating his appearance on behalf of the defendants (Doc. No. 36 ), was mailed to the defendants. Such proof of service must be docketed within 7 days. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to Attorney DeRosa via email at david.derosa1973@gmail.com, and by mail at Law Offices of David V. DeRosa, 42 Terrace Avenue, P.O. Box 992, Naugatuck, CT 06770. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/31/2020.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #37 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Barbara Gaydosh and Timber Hill Farm LLC (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Barbara Gaydosh, Timber Hill Farm LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen J. Riccardulli* *Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC* *640 Fifth Avenue, 9th Floor* *New York, NY 10019-6102*. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020. Discovery due by 6/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Janet C. Hall added. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Barbara Gaydosh, Timber Hill Farm LLC. (Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Barbara Gaydosh, Timber Hill Farm LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5580043.), filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Riccardulli, Stephen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATERPILLAR FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Riccardulli