This case was last updated from PACER on 06/25/2020 at 06:10:19 (UTC).

Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Offshore Marine Contractors Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Offshore Marine Contractors Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03750

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation

Defendant

Offshore Marine Contractors Inc.

Garnishee

Arena Offshore LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katriel Chaim Statman

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 3700

Houston, TX 77010

Christopher M Hannan

Attorney at Baker Donelson, et al

201 St. Charles Ave, Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant Attorneys

Harry Edson Morse

Attorney at Bohman Morse LLC

650 Poydras Street, Ste. 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Martin Stewart Bohman

Attorney at Bohman Morse, LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Garnishee Attorney

Mitchell E Ayer

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

333 Clay St, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohman, Martin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed.(Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Setting as to #9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

14 #12

Proposed Order Proposed Order

14 #11

Appendix Appendix J

14 #10

Appendix Appendix I

14 #9

Appendix Appendix H

14 #8

Appendix Appendix G

14 #7

Appendix Appendix F

14 #6

Appendix Appendix E

14 #2

Appendix Appendix A

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix List, #2 Appendix Appendix A, #3 Appendix Appendix B, #4 Appendix Appendix C, #5 Appendix Appendix D, #6 Appendix Appendix E, #7 Appendix Appendix F, #8 Appendix Appendix G, #9 Appendix Appendix H, #10 Appendix Appendix I, #11 Appendix Appendix J, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Raimy D. Eymard

9 #1

Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate

#9

(#9) MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Raimy D. Eymard, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohman, Martin) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 12/5/2019. The case is stayed pursuant to section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Appearances:Jan Hayden. Katriel Chaim Statman, Martin Stewart Bohman.Mitchell E Ayer, Christopher M Hannan. (Court Reporter: L. Wells), filed.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohman, Martin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed.(Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Setting as to #9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix List, #2 Appendix Appendix A, #3 Appendix Appendix B, #4 Appendix Appendix C, #5 Appendix Appendix D, #6 Appendix Appendix E, #7 Appendix Appendix F, #8 Appendix Appendix G, #9 Appendix Appendix H, #10 Appendix Appendix I, #11 Appendix Appendix J, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Arena Offshore LP, filed. (Ayer, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Arena Offshore LP, filed. (Ayer, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Christopher Hannan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Christopher Hannan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2019. (Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Raimy D. Eymard, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohman, Martin) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service Executed as to Arena Offshore, LP on 10/8/19 re: Writ of Garnishment, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Harry Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Harry E. Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2019. (Bohman, Martin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Offshore Marine Contractors Inc., filed. (Bohman, Martin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ of Garnishment.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) (Attachments: #1 Writ) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison(Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Offshore Marine Contractors Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23274116) filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Statman, Katriel) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.