This case was last updated from PACER on 03/04/2020 at 15:14:05 (UTC).

Catchpole v. Homeland Housewares, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Catchpole filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Homeland Housewares, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth A. Wolford and Marian W. Payson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06459

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

Referral Judge

Marian W. Payson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Catchpole

Defendants

Nutriliving, LLC

Homeland Housewares, LLC

Nutribullet, LLC

Call to Action, LLC

Capital Brands, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron Matthew Lavine

Attorney at Abir Cohen Treyzon Salo, LLP

16001 Ventura Blvd, #200

Encino, CA 91436

Richard A. Plukas

Attorney at Fitzsimmons, Nunn, Fitzsimmons & Plukas, LLP

16 E. Main Street, Suite 300

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant Attorney

Eric T. Krejci

Attorney at Clausen Miller, P.C.

28 Liberty Street, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER Plaintiff APRIL CATCHPOLE's causes of action for (5) Breach of Implied Warranty of Merchantability and (6) Violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. be dismissed and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/11/2020. (BK) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER THEREON by April Catchpole. (Lavine, Aaron) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

9 #1

Memorandum in Support In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Call to Action, LLC, Capital Brands, LLC, Homeland Housewares, LLC, Nutribullet, LLC, Nutriliving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Krejci, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Krejci on behalf of All Defendants (Krejci, Eric) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

4 #3

Pro Hac Vice Order

4 #2

Registration Form

4 #1

Attorney's Oath

#4

(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Matthew Lavine. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/6/2019. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/06/2019)

3 #4

Summons

2 #5

Summons

2 #4

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3500151, filed by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Plukas, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BK) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/18/2020. (BK) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Plaintiff APRIL CATCHPOLE's causes of action for (5) Breach of Implied Warranty of Merchantability and (6) Violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. be dismissed and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/11/2020. (BK) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #11 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER THEREON by April Catchpole. (Lavine, Aaron) (BK) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO DISMISS CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; AND ORDER THEREON by April Catchpole. (Lavine, Aaron) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER re #9 Motion to Dismiss. Responses are due on or before 8/30/2019. Upon receipt of all papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will advise the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/09/2019. (PFC) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Call to Action, LLC, Capital Brands, LLC, Homeland Housewares, LLC, Nutribullet, LLC, Nutriliving, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Krejci, Eric) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Krejci on behalf of All Defendants (Krejci, Eric) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Matthew Lavine. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/6/2019. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service)(Plukas, Richard) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT Civility Principles & Guidelines by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Civility Principles & Guidelines)(Plukas, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-Filing Notification: Re #4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $150 receipt number 0209-3510873.) The motion is missing the Civility Principal Oath. Action Required: fill out and submit the required Civility Principal Oath form. (BK) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3510873.) by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Attorney's Oath, #2 Registration Form, #3 Pro Hac Vice Order, #4 Application, #5 Sponsoring Affidavit, #6 Lavine Input Sheet)(Plukas, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Sent notification to the MDL of a potential new case. (BK) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (BK) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3500151, filed by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Plukas, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by April Catchpole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BK) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.