This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:18:28 (UTC).

Catchings v. State of Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Catchings filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Abdul K Kallon and John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01692

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

Referral Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Keith Catchings

Talladega, AL 35161

Respondents

State of Alabama

Steve Giddens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Kristi O Wilkerson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

501 Washington Avenue, P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#5

4 #14

Exhibit N

4 #13

Exhibit M

4 #12

Exhibit L

4 #11

Exhibit K

4 #10

Exhibit J

4 #9

Exhibit I

4 #8

Exhibit H

4 #7

Exhibit G

4 #6

Exhibit F

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - The petitioner indicating he has not received a copy of Respondents answer to his petition, (doc. #4 ). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a copy of the answer. Petitioners deadline to file a traverse is extended to January 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/14/2020. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4 Answer to Complaint, by Robert Keith Catchings. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to re #5 Order filed by Robert Keith Catchings. (MEB2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #4 Answer to Complaint, filed by State of Alabama; This Order is to inform Petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials in opposition to the response and of the possible consequences of not responding. Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a report and recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/30/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Respondent's ANSWER to Complaint by State of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi O Wilkerson on behalf of State of Alabama (Wilkerson, Kristi) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Respondent appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/29/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 B4601109315), filed by Robert Keith Catchings. (MEB2) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi O Wilkerson