This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 13:16:21 (UTC).

Castruita et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Castruita filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen Cardone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen Cardone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gloria Delapaz Castruita

Jose L. Castruita

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert C. Lane

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

6200 Savoy, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Joshua D. Gordon

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm

6200 Savoy Drive Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Marc Daniel Cabrera

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

2950 N. Harwood, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Elizabeth Frances Hayes

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

2950 N. Harwood Street, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER that the parties meet, confer, and submit a joint report of parties planning meeting as specified in the Courts Standing Order on Pretrial deadlines no later than August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

15 #3

Exhibit C

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) COUNTERCLAIM against Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

Notice of Correction: re #5 Pro Hac Vice Letter. Attorney Joshua D. Gordon is admitted to practice in the Western District of Texas. Disregard the pro hac vice ltr. (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#9) NOTICE of Non-Filing by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Supplement Civil Cover Sheet by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER that the parties meet, confer, and submit a joint report of parties planning meeting as specified in the Courts Standing Order on Pretrial deadlines no later than August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COUNTERCLAIM against Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- DOT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Notary Service Request, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- ALTA Settlement Statement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Notice to Cure, #5 Proposed Order Order)(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by Jose L. Castruita, Gloria Delapaz Castruita. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- DOT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Notary Service Request, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- ALTA Settlement Statement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Notice to Cure)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mn). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to July 21, 2020, Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION)(Lane, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Non-Filing by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: re #5 Pro Hac Vice Letter. Attorney Joshua D. Gordon is admitted to practice in the Western District of Texas. Disregard the pro hac vice ltr. (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Supplement Civil Cover Sheet by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13677007), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less