This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2020 at 07:39:16 (UTC).

Esteban Castro v. Qurate Retail, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Esteban Castro filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Qurate Retail, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02265

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esteban Castro

Defendants

QVC, Inc.

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Qurate Retail, Inc.

Qurate Retail Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kiley Lynn Grombacher

Lirit Ariella King

Marcus J Bradley

Defendant Attorneys

Lara A Grines

Daniel C Whang

Timothy L Hix

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro.(Grombacher, Kiley) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulations to Dismiss Party #14 , #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. The correct case number must include the judges' initials, for example: 5:19-cv-2265 JGB(SHKx) In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Qurate Retail, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro.(Grombacher, Kiley) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Qurate Retail Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro.(Grombacher, Kiley) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A Standing Order

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Standing Order filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Standing Order)(Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc., identifying 1. Esteban Castro, Plaintiff 2. Qvc, Inc. 3. Qurate Retail, Inc. 4. Qurate Retail Group, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Emily Reybitz re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Lara A. Grines re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1932035 Receipt No: 0973-24853840 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Lara A Grines added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lara A Grines added to party Qurate Retail Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lara A Grines added to party Qurate Retail, Inc.(pty:dft))(Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro.(Grombacher, Kiley) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulations to Dismiss Party #14 , #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. The correct case number must include the judges' initials, for example: 5:19-cv-2265 JGB(SHKx) In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Qurate Retail, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro.(Grombacher, Kiley) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Qurate Retail Group, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro.(Grombacher, Kiley) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Standing Order filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Standing Order)(Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/25/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Esteban Castro. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/24/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc., identifying 1. Esteban Castro, Plaintiff 2. Qvc, Inc. 3. Qurate Retail, Inc. 4. Qurate Retail Group, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Emily Reybitz re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of Lara A. Grines re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1932035 Receipt No: 0973-24853840 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants QVC, Inc., Qurate Retail Group, Inc., Qurate Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Lara A Grines added to party QVC, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lara A Grines added to party Qurate Retail Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lara A Grines added to party Qurate Retail, Inc.(pty:dft))(Grines, Lara) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less