This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 07:11:40 (UTC).

Castro v. Gardner Trucking, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Castro filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Gardner Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05473

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcelino Castro

Defendant

Gardner Trucking, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Noel Ilg

Attorney at ILG Legal Office, PC

156 South Spruce Avenue, Unit 206A

South San Francisco, CA 94080

Richard C. Alpers

Attorney at Alpers Law Group, Inc.

P.O. Box 1540

Aptos, CA 95001

George L. Lin

Attorney at ILG Legal Office, PC

156 South Spruce Avenue, Unit 206A

South San Francisco, CA 94080

Defendant Attorneys

Shaun Jordan Voigt

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

2050 Main Street, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Kristen Jeannine Nesbit

Attorney at Fisher Phillips LLP

444 S. Flower Street, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Standing Order

#14

13 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#13

12 #1

Declaration Declaration of George Lin

#12

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD VIA ZOOM. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/9/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website: www.cand.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Marcelino Castro (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lin, George) (Filed on 9/3/2020) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT TO JOIN by Marcelino Castro (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of George Lin)(Ilg, Stephen) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins no longer assigned to case Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gardner Trucking, Inc... (Voigt, Shaun) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gardner Trucking, Inc. (Voigt, Shaun) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/28 /2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#1) Answer to Removal Complaint(See Exhibit B of Removal) by Gardner Trucking, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/7/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byGardner Trucking, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Voigt, Shaun) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Trucking, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CRST International, Inc. for Gardner Trucking, Inc.. re 1 Notice of Removal, (Voigt, Shaun) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Gardner Trucking, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, (Voigt, Shaun) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV001617. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14785110). Filed byGardner Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voigt, Shaun) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDNER TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Jeannine Nesbit

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaun J Voigt