This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 08:09:56 (UTC).

Castro et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Castro filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy B Vitter and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03551

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy B Vitter

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glenda Castro

Henry Castro

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Galen M. Hair

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC

3540 S I-10 Service Rd W, Suite 300

Metairie, LA 70001

William Parker Logan

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S. I-10 Service Rd. W, Suite 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

Eleanor Weeks Wall

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson (Baton Rouge)

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Michelle DeLoach Brooks

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson (Thibodeaux)

211 W. Fifth St.

Thibodaux, LA 70301-3199

Charles L. Chassaignac, IV

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson (Baton Rouge)

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Davis Ragland Peltier

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel and Johnson

211 West Fifth Street

Thibodaux, LA 70301

Emily Stickney Morrison

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel and Johnson LLP

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Emily Barbera Wood

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson

211 W. Fifth Street

Thibodaux, LA 70301

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(lag) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

10 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

10 #3

Exhibit

10 #2

Exhibit

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) Amended Notice of Removal against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Michelle) Modified on 10/20/2022 (cg). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: On September 29, 2022, Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. filed a Notice of Removal in this Court, asserting that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case based upon 28 U.S.C. 1332, diversity jurisdiction. The Notice of Removal, however, fails to adequately allege the citizenship of the parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Notice of Removal, without further leave of Court, properly setting forth the citizenship particulars of all of the parties, as required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/18/22.(cg) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Brooks, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #2 Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file responsive pleadings is CONTINUED to October 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/30/2022. (cwa) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#6

(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/22.(cg) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit

2 #1

Proposed Order

2 #2

Main Document

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(lag) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended Notice of Removal against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Michelle) Modified on 10/20/2022 (cg). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: On September 29, 2022, Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. filed a Notice of Removal in this Court, asserting that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case based upon 28 U.S.C. 1332, diversity jurisdiction. The Notice of Removal, however, fails to adequately allege the citizenship of the parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Notice of Removal, without further leave of Court, properly setting forth the citizenship particulars of all of the parties, as required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/18/22.(cg) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Brooks, Michelle) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #2 Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file responsive pleadings is CONTINUED to October 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/30/2022. (cwa) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/22.(cg) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Notice of List of Parties and Copies of Pleadings and Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brooks, Michelle) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Brooks, Michelle) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Michelle) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC Parish of Jefferson, case number 831-401 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9579882) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Michelle DeLoach Brooks added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Brooks, Michelle) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hurricane Ida Program Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis Joseph Lobrano