This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 08:00:06 (UTC).

Castrillo v. Coloplast Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Castrillo filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Coloplast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Castrillo

Defendant

Coloplast Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph A. Osborne

Attorney at Osborne & Associates Law Firm P.A.

Suite 271, 433 Plaza Real Blvd.

Boca Raton, FL 33432-3945

Brittany Rygiel

Attorney at Moll Law Group

15Th Floor, 22 W Washington St

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

David J. Walz

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd, Ste. 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Coloplast Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19330354) filed by Carmen Castrillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osborne, Joseph) Modified on 3/11/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/14/2022. (MB) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Verified MOTION for Brittany Rygiel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19352361 for $150 by Carmen Castrillo. (Attachments: #1 Local Counsel Consent)(Osborne, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

7 #1

Local Counsel Consent

#9

(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/29/2022 by Carmen Castrillo as to Coloplast Corporation. (Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/29/2022 by Carmen Castrillo as to Coloplast Corporation. (Rygiel, Brittany) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/21/2022. (Baker, David) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Verified MOTION for Brittany Rygiel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19352361 for $150 by Carmen Castrillo. (Attachments: #1 Local Counsel Consent)(Osborne, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ALL) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/15/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Brittany Rygiel Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) ctp (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/14/2022. (MB) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:22-cv-0518-WWB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Coloplast Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19330354) filed by Carmen Castrillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osborne, Joseph) Modified on 3/11/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLOPLAST CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Walz