This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 13:09:55 (UTC).

Castleman-Goodwin et al v. Lindsay et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Castleman-Goodwin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lindsay. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alistair Newbern and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01071

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Castleman-Goodwin

Rene Cerda

Defendants

Alan E. Lindsay

Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.

750 Old Hickory Boulevard, Brentwood Commons Two, Suite 275

Brentwood, TN 37027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mackenzie Cover

Attorney at Michael D. Ponce & Associates

400 Professional Park Drive

Goodlettsville, TN 37072

Andrea I. Meloff-Stilgenbauer

Attorney at Michael D. Ponce & Associates

400 Professional Park Drive

Goodlettsville, TN 37072

Defendant Attorneys

John W. Baker, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, O'Kane, Atkins & Thompson

P O Box 1708, 2607 Kingston Pike, Suite 200

Knoxville, TN 37901-1708

Scott A. Rhodes

Attorney at White & Rhodes, PC

750 Old Hickory Boulevard, Suite 275

Brentwood, TN 37027

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit E First Acceptance Ins Return of Service

1 #6

Exhibit D First Acceptance Ins Summons

1 #5

Exhibit C Penske Return of Service

1 #4

Exhibit B Penske Summons

1 #3

Exhibit A Complaint

1 #2

Attachment - Notice of Filing Exhibits

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to April 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/10/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 2/10/2021. (Hearing lasted 00:11)(sd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal Filed on behalf of all parties by Mary Castleman-Goodwin. (Meloff-Stilgenbauer, Andrea) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Andrea I. Meloff-Stilgenbauer admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Filed on behalf of all parties filed by All Plaintiffs. (Meloff-Stilgenbauer, Andrea) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Andrea I. Meloff-Stilgenbauer on behalf of Mary Castleman-Goodwin. (Meloff-Stilgenbauer, Andrea) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on February 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/26/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc..(Rhodes, Scott) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (kc) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation.(Baker, John) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#5 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (kc) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation that counsel for Penske has served a copy of the Notice for Case Management Conference on counsel for Plaintiff and all removal documents. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. (Baker, John) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Mackenzie Cover: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 1/6/2021. (kc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for John W. Baker, Jr., Mackenzie Cover admitted to this court. (kc) Modified on 12/16/2020 (kc). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mary Castleman-Goodwin and Rene Cerda from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 20C2530. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3276219) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Notice of Filing Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A Complaint, #4 Exhibit B Penske Summons, #5 Exhibit C Penske Return of Service, #6 Exhibit D First Acceptance Ins Summons, #7 Exhibit E First Acceptance Ins Return of Service)(kc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Rhodes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W Baker, Jr